This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:37:14 (UTC).

WALLACE v. HOWELL et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WALLACE filed an Other lawsuit against HOWELL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03692

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEPHEN P. WALLACE

Aurora, IL 60505

Respondents

BERYL A. HOWELL

JAMES E. BOASBERG

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/08/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #1

Additional Documents to Complaint

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 01/23/2020.....ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/08/2020. (zmc) Modified on 1/23/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Additional Documents to Petition) (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/23/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/23/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 01/23/2020.....ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/08/2020. (zmc) Modified on 1/23/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/08/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by STEPHEN P. WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Additional Documents to Petition) (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.