This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2019 at 06:33:44 (UTC).

Wallace v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Wallace against Alabama Department of Corrections INMATE 1 in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Jeremain Wallace

Elmore, AL 36025

Defendants

Ronald Reagan

Alabama Department of Corrections

Thomas E. Kilby

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) AMENDMENT (My Claim Monetary Relief) TO #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(am, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) ORDER ON MOTION DIRECTING payment of initial partial filing fee of $8.33; GRANTING an extension from 12/3/2019 to and including 12/10/2019 to forward to the Clerk of this Court the initial partial filing fee of $8.33, as further set out in Order; ORDERING that other than the change in the amount of the initial partial filing fee due from the plaintiff the directives of the #3 order entered on 11/8/2019 remain in full force and effect. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (Furnished to Cashier)(am, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER ON MOTION DENYING the #4 Motion for release from prison custody. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (am, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 to correct pleading title as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) MOTION to be Released from Prison Custody by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $14.83 be paid on or before 12/3/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order, as further set out in Order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2019. (Furnished to Cashier) (am, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (es, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Thomas E. Kilby, Ronald Reagan, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(es, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDMENT (My Claim Monetary Relief) TO #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(am, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER ON MOTION DIRECTING payment of initial partial filing fee of $8.33; GRANTING an extension from 12/3/2019 to and including 12/10/2019 to forward to the Clerk of this Court the initial partial filing fee of $8.33, as further set out in Order; ORDERING that other than the change in the amount of the initial partial filing fee due from the plaintiff the directives of the #3 order entered on 11/8/2019 remain in full force and effect. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (Furnished to Cashier)(am, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ON MOTION DENYING the #4 Motion for release from prison custody. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/2019. (am, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 to correct pleading title as reflected in pleading (am, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to be Released from Prison Custody by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (am, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $14.83 be paid on or before 12/3/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order, as further set out in Order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2019. (Furnished to Cashier) (am, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Antonio Jeremain Wallace. (es, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Thomas E. Kilby, Ronald Reagan, filed by Antonio Jeremain Wallace.(es, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.