This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2020 at 09:24:15 (UTC).

Wallace et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Wallace filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01184

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marina Haba

Joe Wallace

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Paul Yuhl

Attorney at Yuhl Carr LLP

4676 Admiralty Way, Suite 550

Marina Del Ray, CA 90292

Defendant Attorneys

Janet L. Hickson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER re: scheduling of initial conferences. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#17

(#17) LETTER/ORDER scheduling an initial organizational meeting by telephone conference on 11/30/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The deadline for submitting proposals for a structure of the organization of plaintiffs' counsel is due 11/20/2020. It would be helpful to receive by 11/20/2020 a summary of the procedural setting of the cases. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Wallace et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California and assigned case number 2:20-cv-08279, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-01184-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/6/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, Central District of California; Case Number 2:20-cv-08279. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#14

(#14) Conditional Transfer Order - 5 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2949, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to Honorable Kristine G. Baker. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janet L Hickson counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Janet L. Hickson as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Janet L Hickson added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hickson, Janet) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) NOTICE of JPML Conditional Transfer Order filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request, #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): See Notice of assignment docket no. 5. Henceforth, the Official complete case number is to include initials of the assigned Judge and Magistrate as : 2:20cv08279 ODW (GJSx). Case is no longer before case opening section. Therefore for this time only, Clerk will assist filer and add missing initials to the summons to be issued by separate entry. No response is necessary to this deficiency notice. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace, identifying Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28018953 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Joe Wallace, Marina Haba. (Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Marina Haba(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Joe Wallace(pty:pla))(Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re: scheduling of initial conferences. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER/ORDER scheduling an initial organizational meeting by telephone conference on 11/30/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The deadline for submitting proposals for a structure of the organization of plaintiffs' counsel is due 11/20/2020. It would be helpful to receive by 11/20/2020 a summary of the procedural setting of the cases. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/29/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Wallace et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California and assigned case number 2:20-cv-08279, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-01184-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/6/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, Central District of California; Case Number 2:20-cv-08279. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Conditional Transfer Order - 5 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2949, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to Honorable Kristine G. Baker. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janet L Hickson counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Janet L. Hickson as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Janet L Hickson added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hickson, Janet) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch counsel for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Adding Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch as counsel of record for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft))(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of JPML Conditional Transfer Order filed by defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Montenegro-Urch, Mayela) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request, #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): See Notice of assignment docket no. 5. Henceforth, the Official complete case number is to include initials of the assigned Judge and Magistrate as : 2:20cv08279 ODW (GJSx). Case is no longer before case opening section. Therefore for this time only, Clerk will assist filer and add missing initials to the summons to be issued by separate entry. No response is necessary to this deficiency notice. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace, identifying Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Marina Haba, Joe Wallace. (Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28018953 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Joe Wallace, Marina Haba. (Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Marina Haba(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher P Yuhl added to party Joe Wallace(pty:pla))(Yuhl, Christopher) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mayela C Montenegro-Urch