This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 13:17:27 (UTC).

Wallace et al v. Jennmar et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Wallace filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Jennmar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-02083

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Larry G Wallace

Lori Wallace

Defendants

Jennmar

James Balcar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Honora McKeown Gathings

Attorney at GATHINGS LAW

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Ste. 406

Birmingham, AL 35209

Lloyd W Gathings, II

Attorney at GATHINGS LAW

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Suite 406, 322-1201, Fax: 322-1202

Birmingham, AL 35209

Reynolds Parker Pittman

Attorney at GATHINGS LAW

2140 11Th Avenue South, Suite 210

Birmingham, AL 35205

Kimberly Brooke Massey

Attorney at GATHINGS LAW

2140 11Th Avenue South, Suite 210

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorney

C Peter Bolvig, III

Attorney at Whitaker Mudd Luke & Wells

2011 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State complaint filed 4/1/20

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Brooke Massey on behalf of Larry G Wallace, Lori Wallace (Massey, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/8/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/4/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennmar. filed by Jennmar (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant James Balcar was dismissed as a party on 12/8/2020. See Doc #1 , Exhibit B, pages 119-120. (KEK) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jennmar. *See Doc #1 , Exhibit B, pages 3-8* (KEK) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jennmar from Circuit Court of Walker County, Alabama, case number 64-cv-2020-900103, filed by Jennmar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State complaint filed 4/1/20, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KEK) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer C Peter Bolvig, III