This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 07:25:29 (UTC).

WALL v. WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 WALL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WAL MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05881

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY M WALL

Defendant

WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JAMES GARRITY

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

FABIAN A RUIZ

Attorney at FORD & HARRISON LLP - MIAMI FL

One Se 3Rd Avenue, Suite 2130

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER ON RULE 26(f)OBLIGATIONS re #8 Initial Scheduling Order.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/8/2020. (alb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/21/2021. Discovery due by 6/8/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/8/2020. (alb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (RUIZ, FABIAN) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (WAL MART STORES EAST LP answer due 12/7/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/30/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint by WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (RUIZ, FABIAN) Modified on 11/30/2020 to amend title (jcw). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES GARRITY on behalf of KELLY M WALL (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (alb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #1

Summons to be issued by clerk

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WAL MART STORES EAST LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5707557.), filed by KELLY M WALL. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ON RULE 26(f)OBLIGATIONS re #8 Initial Scheduling Order.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/8/2020. (alb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/21/2021. Discovery due by 6/8/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/8/2020. (alb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (RUIZ, FABIAN) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (WAL MART STORES EAST LP answer due 12/7/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/30/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (jcw) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint by WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (RUIZ, FABIAN) Modified on 11/30/2020 to amend title (jcw). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES GARRITY on behalf of KELLY M WALL (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to WAL MART STORES EAST LP. (alb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WAL MART STORES EAST LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5707557.), filed by KELLY M WALL. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less