This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 10:52:20 (UTC).

Wall v. Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Wall filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01425

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lela Wall

Defendants

Public Utility District No. 1 of Snohomish County

Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County

Public Utility District No

Snohomish County Public Utility District No

Snohomish County PUD

Snohomish County Public Utility District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J Stockwell

Attorney at STOCKWELL LAW FIRM PLLC

600 Stewart Stste 300 & 400

Seattle, WA 98101-1257

Defendant Attorney

Christopher M Huck

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibits with Redactions

8 #1

Complaint Complaint with Redactions

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County. (RE) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

5 #1

Summons Errata

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Summons to be Issued

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit List

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1 Complaint: Per the phone call with Plaintiff's Attorney, Dkt. #1 & #1 -1 has been sealed. A redacted version has been filed at dkt. #8 . (SR) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint, to replace DKT 1 and 1-1 by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint with Redactions, #2 Exhibit Exhibits with Redactions)(Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County. (RE) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #2 Praecipe for a Summons, #1 Complaint, Errata by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Attachments: #1 Summons Errata)(Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Lela Wall. (Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lela Wall (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to be Issued)(Stockwell, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Public Utility District No. 1 of Snohomish County with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7296803), filed by Lela Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stockwell, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced to flatten malformed PDF on 10/19/2021) (STP). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M Huck