This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2021 at 08:15:28 (UTC).

WALKER v. VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 WALKER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IAN E. WALKER

Evansville, IN 47712

Defendant

VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Craig R. Emig

Attorney at JONES WALLACE LLC

20 N.W. Third Street, Suite 400

Evansville, IN 47706

David L. Jones

Attorney at JONES WALLACE, LLC

20 N.W. Third Street, Suite 400

Evansville, IN 47706

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Complaint Form

#9

(#9) ENTRY DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE ACTION - The clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If Mr. Walker wishes to pursue the claims asserted in this action, he may do so by filing a civil rights omplaint to initiate a new action. The clerk is directed to include a civil rights complaint form with Mr. Walker's copy of this entry. Mr. Walker should be aware that the statute of limitations applicable to 1983 claims originating in Indiana is two years. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form)(AAS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Emig on behalf of Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Emig, Craig) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Jones, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Jones on behalf of Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Jones, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT, DISMISSING DEFICIENT CLAIMS, SEVERING UNRELATED CLAIMS, AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS (Originally docketed in 3:20-cv-239-RLY-MPB). SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/7/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff IAN E. WALKER. (JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, filed by IAN E. WALKER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE ACTION - The clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If Mr. Walker wishes to pursue the claims asserted in this action, he may do so by filing a civil rights omplaint to initiate a new action. The clerk is directed to include a civil rights complaint form with Mr. Walker's copy of this entry. Mr. Walker should be aware that the statute of limitations applicable to 1983 claims originating in Indiana is two years. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form)(AAS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Emig on behalf of Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Emig, Craig) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Jones, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Jones on behalf of Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Jones, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT, DISMISSING DEFICIENT CLAIMS, SEVERING UNRELATED CLAIMS, AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS (Originally docketed in 3:20-cv-239-RLY-MPB). SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/7/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff IAN E. WALKER. (JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, filed by IAN E. WALKER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JRB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig R. Emig