This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2020 at 08:13:05 (UTC).

Walker v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Walker filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00316

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornelia Walker

Defendant

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick A Cruise

Attorney at The Hamilton Firm

2401 Broad Street, Suite 102

Chattanooga, TN 37408

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E Schmidtke

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak and Stewart, PC (Valparaiso)

56 S. Washington St., Ste. 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

Lucille Lattimore Nelson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart (Greenville)

300 North Main Street, Ogletree Building

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/2/2020. (JBB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

14 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark E. Schmidtke ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4177081.) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

13 #1

Other Notice Of Consent/ Non-Consent

#13

(#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Of Consent/ Non-Consent) (BDG) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucille Lattimore Nelson on behalf of Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cornelia Walker. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada served on 11/18/2019. (Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #2

Other Summons

1 #1

Other Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4122407.), filed by Cornelia Walker. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Other Summons)(Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/2/2020. (JBB) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-2-. (KMG) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark E. Schmidtke ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4177081.) filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (BDG) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark E. Schmidtke ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4177081.) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Of Consent/ Non-Consent) (BDG) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer up to and including December 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 12-2-19. This entry is the Order of the Court. No document is attached. (KMG) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucille Lattimore Nelson on behalf of Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Nelson, Lucille) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cornelia Walker. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada served on 11/18/2019. (Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/04/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4122407.), filed by Cornelia Walker. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Other Summons)(Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucille Lattimore Nelson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E. Schmidtke Esquire