This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 07:58:58 (UTC).

Clifton Walker v. Smitray, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Clifton Walker filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Smitray, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10364

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLIFTON WALKER

Defendants

SMITRAY, INC.

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Patrick Hall

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathan Vern Okelberry

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 5, 2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc. (Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc., (Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc..(Attorney Justin Patrick Hall added to party Smitray, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Smitray, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 CLIFTON WALKER. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CLIFTON WALKER. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28983978 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party CLIFTON WALKER(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 5, 2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc. (Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc., (Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Smitray, Inc..(Attorney Justin Patrick Hall added to party Smitray, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hall, Justin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Smitray, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 CLIFTON WALKER. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CLIFTON WALKER. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28983978 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party CLIFTON WALKER(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan V. Okelberry(Designation Retained)