This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2022 at 08:29:45 (UTC).

Walker v. Return Management Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Walker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Return Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Walker

Defendants

Return Management Services, Inc. doing business as RMS

Elwood Staffing Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.

Derrek William Cummings

Larry A. Weisberg

Michael J Bradley

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Return Management Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5824535), filed by Ryan Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Return Management Services, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/25/2022) (gs). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Amended Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/28/22. (dmn) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ryan Walker. Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Walker. Return Management Services, Inc. served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. (Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Ryan Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry A. Weisberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

7 #1

Affidavit of Larry A. Weisberg

7 #2

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Return Management Services, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/21/22. (rw) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

03/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Return Management Services, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/21/22. (rw) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Ryan Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry A. Weisberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Walker. Return Management Services, Inc. served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. (Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ryan Walker. Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Weisberg, Larry) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/28/22. (dmn) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Amended Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Return Management Services, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (gs) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/25/2022) (gs). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Return Management Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5824535), filed by Ryan Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less