This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 19:14:45 (UTC).

Walker v. Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Walker filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Soto and Lynnette C Kimmins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Soto

Referral Judge

Lynnette C Kimmins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frances Walker

Defendants

Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan

UnitedHealth Group

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Rain Bird Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erin Rose Ronstadt

Attorney at Ronstadt Law PLLC

P.O. Box 34145

Phoenix, AZ 85067

Clayton Warren Richards

Attorney at Ronstadt Law PLLC

P.O. Box 34145

Phoenix, AZ 85067

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph G Adams

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Bradley Ray Pollock

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

David J Hanus

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2375 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Kristina Novotny Holmstrom

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ann-Martha Andrews

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (DLC) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#50

(#50) ORDER pursuant to #49 Stipulation of Dismissal: this matter is hereby DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own fees and costs.The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and close the file in this case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 3/11/2021. (DLC) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

49 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#49

(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frances Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#48

(#48) ORDERED that the Stipulation #47 is GRANTED. The parties shall have up to and including 2/15/21, in which to finalize settlement and submit aStipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/5/21. (CKS) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

47 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#47

(#47) STIPULATION re: #46 Notice of Settlement for extension of time to complete settlement by Frances Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Settlement by Frances Walker. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#45

(#45) NOTICE re: Settlement Talks by Rain Bird Corporation, Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan . (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

#3

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (DLC) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER pursuant to #49 Stipulation of Dismissal: this matter is hereby DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own fees and costs.The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and close the file in this case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 3/11/2021. (DLC) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frances Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDERED that the Stipulation #47 is GRANTED. The parties shall have up to and including 2/15/21, in which to finalize settlement and submit aStipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/5/21. (CKS) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) STIPULATION re: #46 Notice of Settlement for extension of time to complete settlement by Frances Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Settlement by Frances Walker. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE re: Settlement Talks by Rain Bird Corporation, Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan . (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Rain Bird Corporation, Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan. (Pollock, Bradley) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group. (Hanus, David) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SECOND NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to UnitedHealth Group. (TAD) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frances Walker: Certified Mail Receipt re: Complaint, Summons, Consent, Civil Cover upon Rain Bird Corporation on 4-2-2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frances Walker: Certified Mail Receipt re: Complaint, Summons, Consent, Civil Cover upon Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan on 4-2-2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frances Walker: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Consent, Civil Cover upon The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company on 3/30/2020. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Rain Bird Corporation, Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan, and UnitedHealth Group with addresses. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Frances Walker. (Attachments: #1 Summons The Plan, #2 Summons Rain Bird, #3 Summons UHG)(Ronstadt, Erin) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Rain Bird Group Insurance Plan, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Rain Bird Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18116868. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-136-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Frances Walker. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18116868 filed by Frances Walker. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rain Bird Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. DBA OPTUM is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Rose Ronstadt