This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2020 at 08:21:31 (UTC).

Walker v. PECO ENERGY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Walker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PECO ENERGY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05162

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Melinda Walker

Defendants

PECO ENERGY COMPANY

EXELON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOANA GAIZELYTE-LACY

Attorney at LEONARD SCIOLLA HUTCHISON LEONARD & TINARI LLP

Two Penn Center Suite 1910, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL V. TINARI

Attorney at LEONARD SCIOLLA HUTCHISON LEONARD & TINARI LLP

Two Penn Center Suite 1910, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICK JOSEPH MCCABE

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

2929 Arch St Suite 800

Philadelphia, PA 19104

VALERIE EIFERT BROWN

Attorney at Holland & Knight

2929 Arch Street, Suite 800

Philadelphia, PA 19104

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY re #11 Order Clawback Agreement (MCCABE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL V. TINARI on behalf of Ashley Melinda Walker with Certificate of Service(TINARI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK JOSEPH MCCABE on behalf of EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCCABE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER AN INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/4/2020. 12/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Exelon Corporation with Certificate of Service by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER APPROVING #7 STIPULATION TO ANSWER BY 12/4/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/17/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney) For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY. (BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION (ECF DOC. NO. #5 ) IS NOT APPROVED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE RENEWED UPON A SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney) For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY. (BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VALERIE EIFERT BROWN on behalf of EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheriff's Office of Erie County re: served Complaint and Summons upon Kim Millette for PECO by In Person - Process Service on 10/27/20 (GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Ashley Melinda Walker re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Exhibits A and B (GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14643972.), filed by Ashley Melinda Walker.(GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY re #11 Order Clawback Agreement (MCCABE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL V. TINARI on behalf of Ashley Melinda Walker with Certificate of Service(TINARI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK JOSEPH MCCABE on behalf of EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCCABE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER AN INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/4/2020. 12/4/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Exelon Corporation with Certificate of Service by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER APPROVING #7 STIPULATION TO ANSWER BY 12/4/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/17/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney) For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY. (BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION (ECF DOC. NO. #5 ) IS NOT APPROVED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BE RENEWED UPON A SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney) For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY. (BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VALERIE EIFERT BROWN on behalf of EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BROWN, VALERIE) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheriff's Office of Erie County re: served Complaint and Summons upon Kim Millette for PECO by In Person - Process Service on 10/27/20 (GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EXELON CORPORATION, PECO ENERGY COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/19/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashley Melinda Walker. (md, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Ashley Melinda Walker re #1 Complaint (Attorney) Exhibits A and B (GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14643972.), filed by Ashley Melinda Walker.(GAIZELYTE-LACY, JOANA) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PECO ENERGY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Exelon Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL V. TINARI