This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2020 at 09:02:39 (UTC).

Walker v. Mid Century Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Walker filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mid Century Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24122

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Walker

Defendant

Mid Century Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

2800 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos Manuel Llorente

Attorney at Law Offices Sanabria Llorente & Associates

1200 South Pine Island Road, Suite 725

Plantation, FL 33324

Anthony David Cutrona

Attorney at Law Offices of Sanabria, Llorente, Marsh and Associates

1200 South Pine Island Road, Suite 725

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #9 Transmittal Letter Sent, #8 Order. (kpe) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#9

(#9) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Remanding Case to State Court to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 2020- 019549-CA-01 (kpe) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Order Remanding Case to State Court. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Any pending Motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jorge J Garcia (Garcia, Jorge) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), COUNT II OF THE STATE COURT COMPLAINT by Mid Century Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

(#4) MID CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Mid Century Insurance Company. (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony David Cutrona on behalf of Mid Century Insurance Company (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #4

Docket Sheet Circuit Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Insurance Policy

1 #1

Exhibit Circuit Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13660139, filed by Mid Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circuit Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Docket Sheet Circuit Court Docket Sheet)(Cutrona, Anthony) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 10/8/2020 (kpe). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #9 Transmittal Letter Sent, #8 Order. (kpe) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Remanding Case to State Court to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 2020- 019549-CA-01 (kpe) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Remanding Case to State Court. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Any pending Motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Jorge J. Garcia re #6 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jorge J Garcia (Garcia, Jorge) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), COUNT II OF THE STATE COURT COMPLAINT by Mid Century Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/22/2020 (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MID CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Mid Century Insurance Company. (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony David Cutrona on behalf of Mid Century Insurance Company (Cutrona, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13660139, filed by Mid Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circuit Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Docket Sheet Circuit Court Docket Sheet)(Cutrona, Anthony) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 10/8/2020 (kpe). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less