This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:43:21 (UTC).

Walker v. Kohl's Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Walker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kohl's Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01462

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Leroy Walker

Indian Springs, NV 89070

Defendants

Kohl's Inc.

Miguel Parra

Cesar Delacruz

Molly Morer

Eliza Hall

Art Sanchez

Las Vegas Metro Police

Joe Lombardo

K Summers

Brian Cornell

Target Inc.

Michelle Gas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P Lowry

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Jonathan C. Pattillo

Attorney at c/o Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. (JM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Relief of Funds by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (JM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Response by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) MOTION for Supplement to 1983 by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (JM) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/3/2021. Motions due by 6/2/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/8/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Pattillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT (Individual) by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Pattillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Michelle Gas, KIN, Inc., Arthur Sanchez. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2020.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michelle Gas, KIN, Inc., Arthur Sanchez that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Kohl's Inc. for KIN, Inc. added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815913-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6114837) by KIN, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. (JM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Relief of Funds by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (JM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Response by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #11 . ERROR: Certificate of Service is not signed. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #11 . (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) VIEW #13 corrected image re RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Supplement to 1983 by Plaintiff David Leroy Walker. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (JM) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/3/2021. Motions due by 6/2/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/8/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Pattillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT (Individual) by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Pattillo, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Michelle Gas, Art Sanchez. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Michelle Gas, KIN, Inc., Arthur Sanchez. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2020.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michelle Gas, KIN, Inc., Arthur Sanchez that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Kohl's Inc. for KIN, Inc. added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815913-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6114837) by KIN, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Las Vegas Metro Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan C. Pattillo