This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:00:10 (UTC).

Walker v. Idaho State Police, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Walker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Idaho State Police. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shana Walker

Defendants

Idaho State Police

John/Jane Does I-V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawnee S Perdue

Attorney at Johnson & Monteleone, L.L.P.

350 N. Ninth Street, Ste. 500

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorneys

Pamela Simmons Howland

Attorney at Idaho Employment Lawyers, PLLC

1116 S. Vista Ave. #474

Boise, ID 83703

Jennifer M Walrath

Attorney at Idaho Employment Lawyers PLLC

1112 W. Main Street, Suite 105

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shana Walker. (Perdue, Shawnee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shana Walker. (Perdue, Shawnee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Candy W. Dale. Parties shall join the hearing by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access code: 5475731, Security code: 5637. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Idaho State Police. (Walrath, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCOVERY PLAN by Idaho State Police . (Walrath, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY PLAN by Shana Walker . (Perdue, Shawnee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho State Police and counsel for Shana Walker re #1 Complaint and #5 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/19/2021. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Simmons Howland on behalf of Idaho State Police (Howland, Pamela)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shana Walker. Idaho State Police served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Perdue, Shawnee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before December 14, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Idaho State Police. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2118093.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Perdue, Shawnee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawnee S Perdue