This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:46:03 (UTC).

Walker et al v. Dasmen Residential Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Walker filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dasmen Residential Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Martin L.C. Feldman, Barry W Ashe and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14634

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Karen Wells Roby

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judges

Martin L.C. Feldman

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Renata Walker

Defendants

RH Chenault Creek, LLC

Triangle Real Estate of Gastonia, Inc.

Dasmen Residential Management, LLC

Wilshire Insurance Company

KFK Group, Inc.

Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.

KFK Development, LLC

Lynd Property Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett

Attorney at Jarrett Law Group

643 Magazine Street, Suite 301A

New Orleans, LA 70130

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Stephen Bergeron

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Tucker Tyler Bohren

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Michael Edward Hill

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tabitha Robertson Durbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Jennifer E. Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Lashon Bell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#3

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Counsel: ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel show cause, if any, why the matters listed on this Order should not be consolidated. Such submissions shall be made in writing and filed only in the record of the first case listed in the caption of the Order. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/6/2020.(ko) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc..Attorney Troy Lashon Bell added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bell, Troy) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Chenault Creek, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Wilshire Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 01/02/20. (NEF: Judge Feldman, Magistrate Judge Roby)(ko) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Chenault Creek, LLC re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Chenault Creek, LLC answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/26/19. (ko) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Wilshire Insurance Company answer due 1/8/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/26/19. (ko) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Chenault Creek, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohren, Tucker) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Chenault Creek, LLC. (clw) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Chenault Creek, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-12035 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8024704) filed by RH Chenault Creek, LLC, Dasmen Residential Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Chenault Creek, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFK Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Latter and Blum Property Management, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant