This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 08:25:48 (UTC).

Walker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Walker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02732

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie J Walker

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ashley Crowell

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP - PHOENIX, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Lani D. Lester

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Charles Silvestri Higgins

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, P.A.

2575 E. Camelback Rd, Ste 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Defendant Attorneys

Shane Gibson Ramsey

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

150 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Eric Alfred Paine

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

1320 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Dell P Chappell

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

1320 Main St., 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 121619. (msn) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Willie J Walker. (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3232097) by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Crowell, Ashley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 120419. (msn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3229109) by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 112519. (msn) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $150 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3214622) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell) Added receipt number on 11/25/2019 (cbs). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#6

(#7) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is hereby terminated as counsel of record for Defendants CR Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated effectively immediately. Attorney Shane G. Ramsey shall remain as counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/30/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16966684 filed by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 121619. (msn) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Plaintiff's motion is hereby GRANTED. John Dalimonte is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/13/19. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Willie J Walker. (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3232097) by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Crowell, Ashley) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 120419. (msn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3229109) by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 112519. (msn) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 112519. (msn) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3223147) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $150 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3214622) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell) Added receipt number on 11/25/2019 (cbs). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of Willie J Walker (Higgins, Charles) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is hereby terminated as counsel of record for Defendants CR Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated effectively immediately. Attorney Shane G. Ramsey shall remain as counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/30/2019. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03666-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16966684 filed by Willie J Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less