This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 06:50:50 (UTC).

Walker v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Walker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Jacquelyn D Austin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01956

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jr. David Richard Walker, Jr

Pelzer, SC 29669

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Letter

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #3

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#5) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (rweb, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by David Richard Walker, Jr. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(rweb, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation, filed by David Richard Walker, Jr. Service due by 9/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit, #3 Envelope)(rweb, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant