This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:18:56 (UTC).

WALKER v. BLACK

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 WALKER filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against BLACK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold L. Murphy and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00206

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harold L. Murphy

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONATHAN BRUCE WALKER

Defendant

Reagan Black

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Joseph Scott Key

Attorney at J. Scott Key, LLC

80 Macon Street

Mcdonough, GA 30253

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst Jonathon Bruce Walker Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3945444, $5 filed by Jonathon Bruce Walker (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEY, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/12/2021 (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:21-cv-00197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/12/2021)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/17/21. (klb) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Certified Mail Returned Receipt re Attorney General #5 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition (jpa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Blackwell Crowder on behalf of Reagan Black (Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Reagan Black (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Reagan Black (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Blackwell Crowder on behalf of Reagan Black (Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Mail Returned Receipt re Attorney General #5 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition (jpa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Reagan Black and Attorney General of the State of Georgia re #5 and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (klb) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED IN ERROR PETITIONER HAS COUNSELClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JONATHAN BRUCE WALKER re #5 Order. (klb) Modified on 11/17/2021 (klb). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 11/17/21. (klb) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:21-cv-00197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred out to the Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/26/2021 (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 11/12/2021 (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JONATHAN BRUCE WALKER; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst Jonathon Bruce Walker Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3945444, $5 filed by Jonathon Bruce Walker (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEY, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 11/12/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith