This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 07:15:19 (UTC).

Walker v. Baldwin et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Walker filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Baldwin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Walker, Jr.

Menard, IL 62259

Defendants

Lt John Doe

John Baldwin

Frank Lawrence

Warden Brookhart

J. Wagner

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Administrative Order

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. The 21-day deadline set forth in this Order does not apply to unserved parties. Deadlines for newly served parties to consent or decline to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge will be set by the Court at a later date. Consent due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Order)(dkd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: The Court has received your payment of the filing fee. Now the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/26/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Edward Walker, Jr.(jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for More Information About Filing Fee Payment by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-1179-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

3 #1

Consent to Magistrate Judge

#4

(#4) ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION for More Information About Filing Fee Payment by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) Modified on 11/1/2019 (jaj). (Entered: 10/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. The 21-day deadline set forth in this Order does not apply to unserved parties. Deadlines for newly served parties to consent or decline to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge will be set by the Court at a later date. Consent due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Order)(dkd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The Court has received your payment of the filing fee. Now the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/26/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34625097719 (amv) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Docket text modified to state "ORDER GRANTING," not "GEANTING." (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for More Information About Filing Fee Payment (Doc. #6 ). Plaintiff's family may remit the $400 filing fee for this case on his behalf, but the Court will not accept a wire transfer. Plaintiff is reminded that he has a deadline of December 2, 2019 to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/1/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 11/1/2019 (tjk). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Edward Walker, Jr.. Document filed in incorrect case. Document to be re-filed in correct case by Clerk's Office Staff. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for More Information About Filing Fee Payment by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY STRICKEN - MOTION for More Information About Filing Fee Payment by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) Modified on 11/1/2019 (jaj). (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-1179-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Walker, Jr. (jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Edward Walker, Jr.(jaj) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.