This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2019 at 08:25:50 (UTC).

Walker, Jr. v. Pinckneyville Correctional Center

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Walker, Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Pinckneyville Correctional Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00998

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ardell Walker, Jr.

Pinckneyville, IL 62274

Defendant

Pinckneyville Correctional Center

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/7/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with an Order of this Court. This dismissal shall NOT count as one of Plaintiff's three allotted strikes under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Pinckneyville Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/7/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the Court with a filing fee of $400.00 or a properly completed IFP Motion on or before October 31, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an additional copy of the form IFP Motion. (Action due by 10/31/2019). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/17/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

2 #1

Motion for IFP

#2

(#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-cv-998-SMY. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP).(jsm2) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pinckneyville Correctional Center filed by Ardell Walker, Jr.(jsm2) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/7/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with an Order of this Court. This dismissal shall NOT count as one of Plaintiff's three allotted strikes under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Pinckneyville Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/7/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the Court with a filing fee of $400.00 or a properly completed IFP Motion on or before October 31, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an additional copy of the form IFP Motion. (Action due by 10/31/2019). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/17/2019. (tjk) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-cv-998-SMY. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP).(jsm2) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Pinckneyville Correctional Center filed by Ardell Walker, Jr.(jsm2) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINCKNEYVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER is a litigant