This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 09:17:05 (UTC).

Walker (ID 122256) v. Geither

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Walker ID 122256 filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Geither. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Crow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03245

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carrie Earlene Walker

Topeka, KS 66607

Respondents

Kansas Department of Corrections

Gloria Geither

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Attachments

#2

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including December 10, 2021, to file a written status report informing the Court whether she intends to pursue further state-court remedies on her claims. The clerk is directed to substitute Gloria Geither, Warden of Topeka Correctional Facility, as Respondent in this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/26/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Petitioner is no longer required to file the status report currently due on or before December 10, 2021. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #4 dismissing matter without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The clerk shall reopen this matter and Petitioner is granted until and including January 7, 2022, to file her written status report regarding whether she intends to pursue state-court remedies. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/08/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including February 2, 2022, to file a written status report. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/17/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including February 2, 2022, to file a written status report. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/17/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT by Petitioner Carrie Earlene Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The clerk shall reopen this matter and Petitioner is granted until and including January 7, 2022, to file her written status report regarding whether she intends to pursue state-court remedies. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/08/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketHABEAS FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631015282. (jsh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #4 dismissing matter without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Petitioner is no longer required to file the status report currently due on or before December 10, 2021. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including December 10, 2021, to file a written status report informing the Court whether she intends to pursue further state-court remedies on her claims. The clerk is directed to substitute Gloria Geither, Warden of Topeka Correctional Facility, as Respondent in this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/26/21. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Response deadline 11/22/2021. Mailed to pro se party Carrie Earlene Walker by regular mail. (jal) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Carrie Earlene Walker. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (jal) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kansas Department of Corrections is a litigant