This case was last updated from PACER on 09/23/2019 at 08:01:27 (UTC).

Walker et al v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Walker filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00107

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Melissa K. Walker

Walker Media, LLC

Michael Clinton Walker

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Outdoor Management Displays, LLC

John Does 1-5

William K. Smith

Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc.

Custom Advertising, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Matthew D. Miller

Attorney at COPELAND, COOK, TAYLOR & BUSH, PA - Hattiesburg

P.O. Box 17619

Hattiesburg, MS 39404

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Tim C. Holleman

Attorney at BOYCE HOLLEMAN AND ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1720 23Rd Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 6, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER arising from telephone conference, regarding settlement conference and pending motions to be held in abeyance. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/5/2019 (lm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

12 #15

Exhibit O answer questions

12 #14

Exhibit N go back read emails

12 #11

Exhibit K reject counter offer

8 #3

Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence

#8

DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Clint Walker

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition for Injunctive Relief

#3

(#9) MOTION Stay consideration Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith (Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#5) ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker, Walker Media, LLC.(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C-Docket Report

1 #3

Exhibit B-Amended Petition

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith from Chancery Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 2019-cv-0197-SM. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006346) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B-Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit C-Docket Report) (CS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 6, 2019 (KPM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2019 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2, U.S. Courthouse, 701 N. Main Street, Hattiesburg, MS before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel, the parties and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/19/19. (KPM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER arising from telephone conference, regarding settlement conference and pending motions to be held in abeyance. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/5/2019 (lm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Keith Starrett: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2019. Participating on behalf of the Plaintiff, Matthew Miller, and on behalf of the Defense, Tim Holleman. (dtj) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2019, 03:30 PM before District Judge Keith Starrett. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1828 and enter passcode 940-8529 to join the call. (dtj) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Settlement filed by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Offer w deadline, #2 Exhibit B be in touch, #3 Exhibit C extension request, #4 Exhibit D where are we, #5 Exhibit E apologize, #6 Exhibit F Clients upset, #7 Exhibit G Ducks in row, #8 Exhibit H Counter Offer, #9 Exhibit I not correct, #10 Exhibit J misread something, #11 Exhibit K reject counter offer, #12 Exhibit L hope doing well, #13 Exhibit M fiduciary duty, #14 Exhibit N go back read emails, #15 Exhibit O answer questions)(Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith (Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 Affidavit Smith)(Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION Stay consideration Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith (Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Walker Media, LLC, Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/12/2019 (lm) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 , #4 , #5 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker, Walker Media, LLC.(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker, Walker Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition for Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Clint Walker)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker, Walker Media, LLC (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Keith Starrett: Telephone Conference held on 8/6/2019 (dtj) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Melissa K. Walker, Michael Clinton Walker, Walker Media, LLC by Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., William K. Smith, Custom Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC.(Holleman, Tim) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2019, 03:30 PM before District Judge Keith Starrett. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1828 and enter passcode 940-8529 to join the call. (dtj) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Custom Advertising, Inc., Custom Outdoor Advertising, Inc., Outdoor Management Displays, LLC, William K. Smith from Chancery Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 2019-cv-0197-SM. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006346) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B-Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit C-Docket Report) (CS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D. Miller