This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2021 at 07:00:10 (UTC).

Walker et al v. Motorola Mobility L L C et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Walker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Motorola Mobility L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty, James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00923

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

Presiding Judges

Terry A Doughty

James D Cain, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

April Marie Walker

James Walker

Stephen Walker

Defendants

Motorola Solutions Inc

Cellular Telecommunications & Internet Association

Z T E Corp

Telecommunications Industry Association

Cricket Wireless L L C

A T & T Mobility L L C

Zhongxing Telecommunication Equipment Corp

C T I A Wirelss Assocation

C T I A Inc

Cricket Communications L L C

Cellular Telecommunications Industry Association

H M D Global OY

Motorola Mobility L L C

T I A

Motorola Inc

Microsoft Mobile Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hunter W Lundy

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Matthew E Lundy

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Rudie Ray Soileau, Jr

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher P Ieyoub

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Terrence J Dee

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

444 W Lake St Ste 4000

Chicago, IL 60606

Russell J Stutes, Jr

Attorney at Stutes & Lavergne

P O Box 1644

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Russell Joseph Stutes

Attorney at Stutes & Lavergne

P O Box 1644

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Vicki L Dexter

Attorney at Law Office of Vicki Dexter

1 Saint Andrews Close

Severna Park, MD 21146

Brennan H Meier

Attorney at Akin Gump et al

2300 N Field St Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Gary J Russo

Attorney at Jones Walker (LAF)

600 Jefferson St Ste 1600

Lafayette, LA 70501

Carmen M Rodriguez

Attorney at Jones Walker (LAF)

600 Jefferson St Ste 1600

Lafayette, LA 70501

Seamus C Duffy

Attorney at Akin Gump et al

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Ste 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Thomas C Watson

Attorney at Watson & Renner

1901 Pennsylvania Ave N W Ste 1005 Ens

Washington, DC 20006

Brennan Holden Meier

Attorney at Akin Gump et al (DAL)

2300 N Field St Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Curtis S Renner

Attorney at Watson & Renner

1901 Pennsylvania Ave N W Ste 1005 Ens

Washington, DC 20006

Seamus Cotter Duffy

Attorney at Akin Gump et al (PA)

2001 Market St Ste 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

J Michael Veron

Attorney at Veron Bice et al

721 Kirby St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Steven M Zager

Attorney at King & Spalding (AUS)

500 W Second St Ste 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#51

50 #3

Proposed order

50 #2

Exhibit

50 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#50

#49

48 #1

Proposed order

#48

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Proposed order

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve defendant. Compliance Deadline set for 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/10/2021. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve with consent sought but not yet obtained by April Marie Walker, James Walker, Stephen Walker. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw #45 proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/1/2021. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to Withdraw Proof of Service by April Marie Walker. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. Motorola Mobility L L C served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. Motorola Solutions Inc served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) WITHDRAWN - SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. Z T E Corp served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) Modified to reflect withdrawn per #49 Order and modified answer due date created by this withdrawn entry on 9/1/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. A T & T Mobility L L C served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. Motorola Inc served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Marie Walker. Cricket Wireless L L C served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (aty,Lundy, Hunter) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Russell J. Stutes, Jr. and Russell J. Stutes, III to Enroll as Counsel by Cellular Telecommunications & Internet Association. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2021. (Attorney Russell J Stutes, Jr added to party Cellular Telecommunications & Internet Association(pty:dft))(aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified on 5/12/2021 to indicate proposed order included within pdf of main document. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. It is ordered that all properly served defendants be given an additional thirty (30) days from service on the last served Defendant to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/6/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Gary J Russo on behalf of A T & T Mobility L L C, Cricket Wireless L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/20/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Motorola Inc, Motorola Mobility L L C, Motorola Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parents, Motorola Mobility Holdings L L C, Lenovo Group Ltd for Motorola Mobility L L C. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher) Modified on 5/6/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with consent by A T & T Mobility L L C, Cricket Wireless L L C, Motorola Inc, Motorola Mobility L L C, Motorola Solutions Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher P Ieyoub added to party A T & T Mobility L L C(pty:dft), Cricket Wireless L L C(pty:dft), Motorola Inc(pty:dft), Motorola Mobility L L C(pty:dft), Motorola Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher) Modified on 5/6/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Terry A Doughty no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/12/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to A T & T Mobility L L C, Cellular Telecommunications & Internet Association, Cricket Wireless L L C, H M D Global OY, Motorola Inc, Motorola Mobility L L C, Motorola Solutions Inc, Telecommunications Industry Association, Z T E Corp. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against A T & T Mobility L L C, Cellular Telecommunications & Internet Association, Cricket Wireless L L C, H M D Global OY, Motorola Inc, Motorola Mobility L L C, Motorola Solutions Inc, Telecommunications Industry Association, Z T E Corp with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4633448) filed by James Walker, Stephen Walker, April Marie Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Hunter W Lundy added to party April Marie Walker(pty:pla), James Walker(pty:pla), Stephen Walker(pty:pla))(aty,Lundy, Hunter) Modified on 4/8/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Attachment 1 replaced with non-fillable form on 4/8/2021) (Crick, S). (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C T I A Wirelss Assocation is a litigant

Latest cases where Cricket Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS OFFICERS AND ADVISORS is a litigant