This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:26:09 (UTC).

Walia v. Poles et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Walia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Poles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol Bagley Amon and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03884

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carol Bagley Amon

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sahib S. Walia

Defendants

Ronald Poles

Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Ali Yusaf

114-08 101St Avenue

S. Richmond Hill, NY 11419

Dino Joseph Domina

Attorney at Law Office of Dino J. Domina

888 Veterans Memorial Highway, Suite 410

Hauppauge, NY 11788

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Lamendola

Attorney at Simmons Jannace DeLuca, LLP

43 Corporate Drive

Hauppauge, NY 11788

Sal F. DeLuca

Attorney at Simmons Jannace DeLuca, LLP

43 Corporate Drive

Hauppauge, NY 11788

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/10/2021. The Court conducts a telephonic initial conference. Discussion held regarding plaintiff's contemplated motion to remand (in connection with which defendants plan to take jurisdictional discovery) and defendants' contemplated motion to consolidate with Singh v. Poles, 19cv1984 (RML). Defendant must serve demands for outstanding HIPAA authorizations by August 11, 2021, to which plaintiff must respond with executed authorizations by August 13, 2021. Fact discovery must be completed by December 10, 2021. Pleadings may be amended and new parties added as of right by October 8, 2021. By October 15, 2021, the parties must file a joint status report. Plaintiff's expert disclosures shall be served by January 21, 2022; defendants' are due by February 22, 2022; expert depositions shall be completed by March 21, 2022. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed Scheduling Order (Initial Conference Questionnaire) by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles (Lamendola, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dino Joseph Domina on behalf of Sahib S. Walia (aty to be noticed) (Domina, Dino) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for August 10, 2021 @ 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on August 6, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/23/2021. (LK) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sahib S. Walia (Yusaf, Asif) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 3 corrupted and replaced on 7/14/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles (Lamendola, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/10/2021. The Court conducts a telephonic initial conference. Discussion held regarding plaintiff's contemplated motion to remand (in connection with which defendants plan to take jurisdictional discovery) and defendants' contemplated motion to consolidate with Singh v. Poles, 19cv1984 (RML). Defendant must serve demands for outstanding HIPAA authorizations by August 11, 2021, to which plaintiff must respond with executed authorizations by August 13, 2021. Fact discovery must be completed by December 10, 2021. Pleadings may be amended and new parties added as of right by October 8, 2021. By October 15, 2021, the parties must file a joint status report. Plaintiff's expert disclosures shall be served by January 21, 2022; defendants' are due by February 22, 2022; expert depositions shall be completed by March 21, 2022. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Scheduling Order (Initial Conference Questionnaire) by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles (Lamendola, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Dino Joseph Domina on behalf of Sahib S. Walia (aty to be noticed) (Domina, Dino) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for August 10, 2021 @ 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on August 6, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/23/2021. (LK) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sal F. DeLuca on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (DeLuca, Sal) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sahib S. Walia (Yusaf, Asif) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 3 corrupted and replaced on 7/14/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles (Lamendola, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Ronald Poles from Supreme Queens, case number 708037/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14643323) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit c, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Lamendola, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Christopher Lamendola