This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 16:43:32 (UTC).

Walga MTE, LLC et al v. Olsson, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 Walga MTE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Olsson, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terence Kern and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terence Kern

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Walga MTE, LLC

Ross Group Construction Corporation, The

Walga Ross Group JV

Defendants

Olsson, Inc.

Olsson Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Edward Harper, Jr

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Timothy Lee Rogers

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Defendant Attorneys

Theresa D Koller

Attorney at Cline Williams Law Firm

12910 Pierce Street, Suite 200

Omaha, NE 68144

Jennifer Rae Annis

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

Michael Pearce Atkinson

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

Kevin Schneider

Attorney at Cline Williams Law Firm

233 S 13Th Street, Suite1900

Lincoln, NE 68508

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/30/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 12/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin Schneider on behalf of Olsson, Inc. [Note: Attorney Kevin Schneider added to party Olsson, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Schneider, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Theresa D Koller on behalf of Olsson, Inc. [Note: Attorney Theresa D Koller added to party Olsson, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Koller, Theresa) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/27/2019) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Theresa Diane Koller and Kevin J. Schneider are admitted Pro Hac Vice for Defendant, Olsson, Inc. ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Pearce Atkinson on behalf of Olsson, Inc. [Note: Attorney Michael Pearce Atkinson added to party Olsson, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Atkinson, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Olsson, Inc. (Annis, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Attorney(s) Schneider/Koller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2100374) by Olsson, Inc. (With attachments) (Annis, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Olsson, Inc. (Annis, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Walga MTE, LLC, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The and Walga Ross Group JV to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Olsson, Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Olsson, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Harper, Jr on behalf of Ross Group Construction Corporation, The, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Harper, John) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walga Ross Group JV (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walga MTE, LLC (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lee Rogers on behalf of Ross Group Construction Corporation, The, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Olsson, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2086842) by Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLSON & ASSOCIATES OF NW FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Group Construction Corporation, The is a litigant