This case was last updated from PACER on 02/22/2021 at 07:16:36 (UTC).

Walden v. POLLO OPERATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Walden filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-25251

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nichelle Walden

Defendants

POLLO OPERATIONS, INC., d/b/a POLLO TROPICAL

POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. doing business as POLLO TROPICAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Juan J. Perez

1414 Nw 107Th Ave., Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorneys

Paul J DeBoe

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

9130 S. Dadeland Blvd., Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

David M. DeMaio

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

9130 S. Dadeland Blvd, Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#11

(#11) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nichelle Walden (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Fiesta Restaurant Group, Inc. for POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. (DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #1

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases., ( Status Report due by 1/20/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Aileen M. Cannon for all further proceedings. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. ORDER granting #9 Motion to Compel; terminating #9 Motion to Dismiss; granting #9 Motion to Stay. The case is STAYED pending resolution of the parties arbitration proceedings. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Motions Terminated: #9 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration And MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Or, In The Alternative MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC.. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nichelle Walden (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Fiesta Restaurant Group, Inc. for POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. (DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration And, MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Or, In The Alternative, MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC.. Responses due by 2/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT DEFENDANTS REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases., ( Status Report due by 1/20/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/5/2021. (mno) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Aileen M. Cannon for all further proceedings. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14096867, filed by POLLO OPERATIONS, INC., d/b/a POLLO TROPICAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(DeBoe, Paul)(No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 12/28/2020 (amb). (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pollo Operations, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan J. Perez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaly Saavedra