This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 09:09:20 (UTC).

Walczak v. Falcon Moving, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Walczak filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Falcon Moving, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jared Walczak

Defendants

Falcon Moving, LLC

Jason Rosko, individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Samuel David Engelson

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT JARED WALCZAK, on behalf of himself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. FALCON MOVING LLC., AND JASON ROSKO, individually filed by Jared Walczak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19098138. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue - Plaintiff Jared Walczak)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

1 #1

Consent To Sue - Plaintiff Jared Walczak

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jared Walczak by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jared Walczak by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 3/30/22 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 3/26/22. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jared Walczak. Falcon Moving, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

6 #1

Notice of Filing

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jared Walczak. Jason Rosko, individually waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

7 #1

Notice of Filing

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 3/30/22 is reset for 4/13/22 at 9:00 a.m. The joint status report is due by 4/8/22. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 3/30/22 is reset for 4/13/22 at 9:00 a.m. The joint status report is due by 4/8/22. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jared Walczak. Jason Rosko, individually waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jared Walczak. Falcon Moving, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 3/30/22 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 3/26/22. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jared Walczak by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jared Walczak by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT JARED WALCZAK, on behalf of himself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. FALCON MOVING LLC., AND JASON ROSKO, individually filed by Jared Walczak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19098138. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue - Plaintiff Jared Walczak)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Billhorn