This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2021 at 08:31:50 (UTC).

Wahlman v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Wahlman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02988

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Wahlman

Defendants

The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc

Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amar Bharat Raval

Attorney at Berg Plummer Johnson Raval

3700 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Linda P Wills

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

909 Fannin Streetste 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mark Wahlman, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

5 #1

Summon

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft's deadline to file their answer to Plaintiff's complaint is November 1, 2021..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft's deadline to file their answer to Plaintiff's complaint is November 1, 2021..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mark Wahlman, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, filed.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27040883) filed by Mark Wahlman.(Raval, Amar) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda P Wills