This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:58:21 (UTC).

Wagstaff et al v. Biolife Plasma Services

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Wagstaff filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Biolife Plasma Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dustin B. Pead, Cecilia M. Romero and Ted Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00971

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

Presiding Judges

Dustin B. Pead

Ted Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Savanah Wagstaff

Joshua Wagstaff

Defendant

Biolife Plasma Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian G. Cueva

Attorney at ADAMS DAVIS PC

35 W Broadway Ste 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

C. Ryan Christensen

Attorney at ADAMS DAVIS PC

35 W Broadway Ste 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Darren A. Davis

Attorney at ADAMS DAVIS PC

35 W Broadway Ste 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Defendant Attorneys

Tracy H. Fowler

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Annika L. Jones

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Biolife Plasma Services.(Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2020. Discovery due by 12/20/2020. Motions due by 12/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/26/2019. (jds) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#14

(#14) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Davis, Darren) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

8 #2

State Notice of Removal

8 #1

State Complaint

#8

(#8) File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal) (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/11/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Biolife Plasma Services, Plaintiffs Joshua Wagstaff, Savanah Wagstaff. Form due by 12/26/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Biolife Plasma Services, Plaintiffs Joshua Wagstaff, Savanah Wagstaff. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Biolife Plasma Services answer due 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/11/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant Biolife Plasma Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Fowler, Tracy) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to Answer(nl). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3438236) filed by Biolife Plasma Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Biolife Plasma Services is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Biolife Plasma Services.(Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2020. Discovery due by 12/20/2020. Motions due by 12/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Ted Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/26/2019. (jds) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Davis, Darren) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/17/2019. (tlc) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#12) DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Robert J. Shelby recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ted Stewart for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/16/19. (dla) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#11) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#10) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Joshua Wagstaff, Savanah Wagstaff. (nl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket(#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Biolife Plasma Services. (nl) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal) (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/11/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Biolife Plasma Services, Plaintiffs Joshua Wagstaff, Savanah Wagstaff. Form due by 12/26/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Biolife Plasma Services, Plaintiffs Joshua Wagstaff, Savanah Wagstaff. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Biolife Plasma Services answer due 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/11/2019. (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant Biolife Plasma Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Fowler, Tracy) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to Answer(nl). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3438236) filed by Biolife Plasma Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Fowler, Tracy) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Biolife Plasma Services is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.