This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 09:10:38 (UTC).

Wagstaff et al v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Wagstaff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Wagstaff

Floy B. Wagstaff

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan M. Nord

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Adriana Johnson

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Defendant Attorneys

Lynn S. Davies

Attorney at RICHARDS BRANDT MILLER NELSON

Po Box 2465111 E Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84110-2465

Rafael A. Seminario

Attorney at RICHARDS BRANDT MILLER NELSON

Po Box 2465111 E Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84110-2465

Sean B. Leonard

Attorney at RICHARDS BRANDT MILLER NELSON

Po Box 2465111 E Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84110-2465

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. (mh) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. (nmt) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. Form due by 12/20/2021. (alf) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

4 #5

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

4 #4

Notice of Removal

4 #3

Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification

4 #2

Notice of Service

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) File downloaded from 2nd District, Weber County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification). (alf) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Second District Court Docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 210906008, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4181444) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second District Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Allstate Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. (mh) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (mh) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#7) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff and Thomas Wagstaff. (mh) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. (nmt) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiffs Floy B. Wagstaff, Thomas Wagstaff. Form due by 12/20/2021. (alf) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) File downloaded from 2nd District, Weber County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification). (alf) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 210906008, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4181444) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second District Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Leonard, Sean) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Allstate Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rafael A. Seminario

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn S. Davies