This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:54:36 (UTC).

Wagner v. McKibben et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Wagner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against McKibben. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Foley, Jr and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00844

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George Foley, Jr

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Wagner

Defendants

John R McKibben

Grape Too

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey I Pitegoff

Attorney at Pitegoff Law Office Inc.

330 East Charleston Blvd., Ste 100

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Mitchell S Bisson

Attorney at Callister & Associates

330 E. Charleston Blvd., Ste. 101

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Matthew Q. Callister

Attorney at Callister & Associates

330 E. Charleston Blvd., Ste. 101

Las Vegas, NV 89104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5552569) by Ashley Wagner. Proof of service due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Callister, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that Plaintiff shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Grape Too, John R McKibben re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Wagner. Grape Too served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ashley Wagner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ashley Wagner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that Plaintiff shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Wagner. Grape Too served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 Complaint was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. In this instance, a document signed by Attorney Jeffrey I Pitegoff was filed using the CM/ECF account of Matthew Callister. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Grape Too, John R McKibben re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5552569) by Ashley Wagner. Proof of service due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Callister, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less