This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:32:24 (UTC).

Tammy Wagner v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Tammy Wagner filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01099

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Wagner

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J McKennon

Attorney at McKennon Law Group PC

20321 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Nicholas Adam West

Attorney at McKennon Law Group APC

20321 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01099 DOC (JDEx). (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#13

(#13) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Tammy Wagner, Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 8/6/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner, (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31516991 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Tammy Wagner(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01099 DOC (JDEx). (esa) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Tammy Wagner, Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 8/6/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner, (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31516991 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Wagner. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Tammy Wagner(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Adam West

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert John McKennon