This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 12:15:44 (UTC).

Wagers v. Hotchkiss et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Wagers filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hotchkiss. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Wier and Hanly A. Ingram. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

Referral Judge

Hanly A. Ingram

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Wagers

Defendants

Stephen R. Hotchkiss

The Reynolds Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles E. Bullard

Attorney at Bullard & Hayes

P.O. Box 17188

Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017

Kenneth A. Sizemore

Attorney at Sizemore Law Office

1356 S. Laurel Road, P.O. Box 1808

London, KY 40743-1808

Defendant Attorneys

Charles H. Cassis

Attorney at Goldberg Simpson, LLC - Prospect

9301 Dayflower Street, Norton Commons

Prospect, KY 40059

Christina R.L. Norris

P.O. Box 386

Prospect, KY 40059

Mary Katherine Brashear

1717 Alliant Avenue, Suite 17

Louisville, KY 40299

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Record Summons and Complaint

1 #3

State Court Record Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

State Court Record Interrogatories

1 #5

State Court Record Notice of Service

1 #6

State Court Record Financial Transactions

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Christina R.L. Norris, Charles H. Cassis, Mary Katherine Brashear. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by The Reynolds Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLC) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(JLC)cc: COR (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#5

(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Reynolds Company. (Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company.(Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company.(Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#9

(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Plan by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company. (Norris, Christina) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER:Court ADOPTS following schedule for discovery and dispositive motions:1. Parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by June 16, 2022. 2. Parties shall have up to and including June 20, 2022, in which to amend pleadings or to join parties. 3. All fact discovery of lay witnesses shall be completed on or before August 15, 2022. All discovery concerning medical issues shall be completed by September 14, 2022. All discovery shall be completed by June 29, 2023. 4. Per Rule 26(a)(2), no later than December 13, 2022, Plaintiff shall disclose identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial accompanied by written reports. Disclosures need not be filed in Court record. No later than January 27, 2023, Defendants shall provide same. Any supplementation by Plaintiff due by February 27, 2023. Any supplementation by Defendant due by March 29, 2023. All expert depositions by Plaintiff shall be completed by May 15, 2023. All expert depositions by Defendants shall be completed by June 29, 2023. 5. No later than August 2, 2023, counsel for parties shall file all dispositive motions, with responses governed by local rules. 6. Court HEREBY ORDERS mid-discovery TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 12/9/2022 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. Conference will be off the record and for counsel only. To join teleconference, parties are DIRECTED to call AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-888-675-2535, enter Access Code 8810053 (followed by "#"), and, when requested, enter Security Code 2275 (followed by "#"). 7. In accordance with District Judge Wier's referral order DE #4 , Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. 8. Court builds case schedule based on party input. Modification of schedule is disfavored and will only occur under standards and mechanics of Rule 16 and/or Rule 6, as applicable. 9. Other than agreed-upon discovery limits within parties' Rule 26(f) report, default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/16/22.(JLC)cc: COR, CD (Entered: 05/16/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER:Court ADOPTS following schedule for discovery and dispositive motions:1. Parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by June 16, 2022. 2. Parties shall have up to and including June 20, 2022, in which to amend pleadings or to join parties. 3. All fact discovery of lay witnesses shall be completed on or before August 15, 2022. All discovery concerning medical issues shall be completed by September 14, 2022. All discovery shall be completed by June 29, 2023. 4. Per Rule 26(a)(2), no later than December 13, 2022, Plaintiff shall disclose identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial accompanied by written reports. Disclosures need not be filed in Court record. No later than January 27, 2023, Defendants shall provide same. Any supplementation by Plaintiff due by February 27, 2023. Any supplementation by Defendant due by March 29, 2023. All expert depositions by Plaintiff shall be completed by May 15, 2023. All expert depositions by Defendants shall be completed by June 29, 2023. 5. No later than August 2, 2023, counsel for parties shall file all dispositive motions, with responses governed by local rules. 6. Court HEREBY ORDERS mid-discovery TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 12/9/2022 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. Conference will be off the record and for counsel only. To join teleconference, parties are DIRECTED to call AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-888-675-2535, enter Access Code 8810053 (followed by "#"), and, when requested, enter Security Code 2275 (followed by "#"). 7. In accordance with District Judge Wier's referral order DE #4 , Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. 8. Court builds case schedule based on party input. Modification of schedule is disfavored and will only occur under standards and mechanics of Rule 16 and/or Rule 6, as applicable. 9. Other than agreed-upon discovery limits within parties' Rule 26(f) report, default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/16/22.(JLC)cc: COR, CD (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #9 Status Report (JLC) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Plan by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company. (Norris, Christina) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Mary Katherine Brashear: An e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Mary Katherine Brashear (JLC) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Mary Katherine Brashear: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #4 REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order,,,,, #6 Order For Meeting and Report,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, Mary Katherine Brashear by US Mail (JLC) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company.(Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephen R. Hotchkiss, The Reynolds Company.(Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates.(2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: see items a - e. Consent form attached. Rule 26 Meeting Report due as stated within the order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form)(JMB)cc: COR (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Reynolds Company. (Norris, Christina) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/19.(JLC)cc: COR (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Christina R.L. Norris, Charles H. Cassis, Mary Katherine Brashear. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by The Reynolds Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLC) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLC) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockcastle Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00033. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5238417), filed by The Reynolds Company, Stephen R. Hotchkiss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court Record Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 State Court Record Interrogatories, #5 State Court Record Notice of Service, #6 State Court Record Financial Transactions)(JLC) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYNOLDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles H. Cassis