This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:14:38 (UTC).

Wagers et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Wagers filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodney Wagers

Patricia Wagers

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Edward Levy

Attorney at Gray & White

713 E Market St., Ste. 200

Louisville, KY 40202

Jacob E. Levy

Attorney at Gray & White - Lou

713 E Market Street, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP - Atlanta

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Foster Bird

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200

Huntington, WV 25719

Megan Basham Davis

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200

Huntington, WV 25719

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

*Restricted*

#8

8 #1

Certified Copy of Master Docket Sheet

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Note: Clerk deleted DE #9 (Case Assignment) due to being docketed in the incorrect case. (TDA) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Submission of Records re Second Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Third) - Remanded Cases involving Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated et al. NOTE: Please see Master Docket Sheet in United States District Court at Arizona Number 2:15-md-2641 for individual documents related to this MDL. (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Master Docket Sheet)(CBD) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:16-cv-03112. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ a copy of the docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3112-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 09/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13395488 filed by Rodney Wagers, Patricia Wagers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 09/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Edward Levy