This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:55:20 (UTC).

WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. MULTI MEDIA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 WAG ACQUISITION, L L C filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MULTI MEDIA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish, Percy Anderson and S. James Otero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07076

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judges

Percy Anderson

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.

Counter Claimants and Defendants

MULTI MEDIA, LLC

Does 1-20

CWIE Holding Company Inc.

CCBILL, LLC

HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED

CWIE LLC

MULTI MEDIA, LLC formerly known as Zmedianow, LLC d/b/a chaturbate.com

Zmedianow, LLC d

HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED doing business as chatbill.com

CWIE LLC doing business as Cavecreek Wholesale Internet Exchange, Cavecreek Web Hosting, and highwebmedia.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David G Liston

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

600 Fifth Avenue 2Nd Floor

New York, NY 10020

Ari J Jaffess

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Alex Gregg Patchen

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Rita M Haeusler

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard and Reed LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Mord Michael Lewis

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Keith J Miller

Attorney at Robinson Miller LLC

110 Edison Place Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Todd M Nosher

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Justin Taylor Quinn

Attorney at Robinson Miller LLC

110 Edison Place Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Andrew Peter MacArthur

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Leda Dunn Wettre

Attorney at Robinson Wettre and Miller LLC

One Newark Center 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Michael James Gesualdo

Attorney at Robinson Miller LLC

110 Edison Place Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Jillian Alexandria Centanni

Attorney at The J A Centanni Law Firm PC

775 Mountain Boulevard Suite 103

Watchung, NJ 07069

Joseph M Paunovich

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Bruce E Van Dalsem

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Ralph A Dengler

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americias 24Th Floor

Ney York, NY 10020

Sarah S Brooks

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Frank M Gasparo

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Dennis C Hopkins

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10112-0085

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#228

(#228) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., identifying WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.; William Grywalski; Harry Emerson; Frome Wye Limited; Ernest Buff; Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC; Liston Abramson LLP; Harold Price; Robert Landmesser. (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#227

(#227) OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case #221 filed by Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

226 #1

Proposed Order

#226

(#226) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mord Michael Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24597266) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

225 #1

Proposed Order

#225

(#225) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24597168) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

224 #1

Proposed Order

221 #1

Proposed Order

#221

(#221) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant MULTI MEDIA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS CECIL HOPKINS on behalf of CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC (HOPKINS, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)

#6

Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MULTI MEDIA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/21/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC, HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED, MULTI MEDIA, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Rule 11.2 and 40.1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC, DOES 1-20, HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED, MULTI MEDIA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5623029) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 11.2 and 40.1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

449 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#228) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., identifying WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.; William Grywalski; Harry Emerson; Frome Wye Limited; Ernest Buff; Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC; Liston Abramson LLP; Harold Price; Robert Landmesser. (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case #221 filed by Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mord Michael Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24597266) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24597168) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Liston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24597070) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24596927) filed by plaintiff WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MULTI MEDIA, LLC, (Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#221) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant MULTI MEDIA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#220) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ralph A. Dengler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MULTI MEDIA, LLC and designating Sarah S. Brooks as local counsel #218 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#219) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank M. Gasparo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MULTI MEDIA, LLC and designating Sarah S. Brooks as local counsel #217 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC identifying CWIE Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HOPKINS, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC. (HOPKINS, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS CECIL HOPKINS on behalf of CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC (HOPKINS, DENNIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MULTI MEDIA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/21/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Multi Media, LLC's Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b).. (NOSHER, TODD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC, HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED, MULTI MEDIA, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CCBILL, LLC, CWIE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., CWIE, LLC, DOES 1-20, HEARILLE SERVICES LIMITED, MULTI MEDIA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5623029) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 11.2 and 40.1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Multi Media, LLC d/b/a chaturbate.com is a litigant

Latest cases where WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORD MICHAEL LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rita M. Haeusler Esquire