This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 08:04:42 (UTC).

WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 WAG ACQUISITION, L L C filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05036

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

STREAMRAY INC.

FriendFinder Networks Inc.

Does 1-20

Not Yet Classified

PHV FRANK M. GASPARO

PHV RALPH A. DENGLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

DAVID G. LISTON

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

MORD MICHAEL LEWIS

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLC

405 Lexington Ave, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

ARI JASON JAFFESS

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

ANDREW P. MACARTHUR

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, The Twenty-Fourth Floor

New York, NY 10020

Jillian Alexandria Centanni

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07201

LEDA DUNN WETTRE

Attorney at ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

One Newark Center, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO

Attorney at Robinson Miller LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

KEITH J. MILLER

Attorney at ROBINSON MILLER LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN

Attorney at ROBINSON MILLER LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

TODD MATTHEW NOSHER

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of Americas, Twenty-Fourth Floor

New York, NY 10020

Sarah Sheldon Brooks

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Frank M. Gasparo

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Ralph Albert Dengler

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Andrew Peter MacArthur

Attorney at Venable LLP

Rockefeller Center, 1270 Avenue Of The Americas, The Twenty-Fourth Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Related Case Ntc

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5720815) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Ntc, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

#5

Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/8/14. (DD, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. MILLER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by TODD MATTHEW NOSHER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (NOSHER, TODD) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. and Ralph A. Dengler, Esq. for by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

9 #1

Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application

9 #2

Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application

#186

(#186) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13744242.) filed by FriendFinder Networks Inc., STREAMRAY INC.. (Gasparo, Frank) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#185

(#185) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

184 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#184

(#184) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable James Donato United States District Court pursuant to General Order 67 Patent Pilot Program. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (as, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

399 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#186) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13744242.) filed by FriendFinder Networks Inc., STREAMRAY INC.. (Gasparo, Frank) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#185) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#184) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable James Donato United States District Court pursuant to General Order 67 Patent Pilot Program. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (as, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#183) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Ralph A. Dengler ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13657451.) filed by FriendFinder Networks Inc., STREAMRAY INC.. (Dengler, Ralph) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#182) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/28/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#181) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#180) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Sheldon Brooks (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#179) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FriendFinder Networks Inc., STREAMRAY INC... (MacArthur, Andrew) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#178) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Peter MacArthur as Counsel for Defendants/Counter-Claimants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Streamray Inc. (MacArthur, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#177) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference for 9/11/2019 10:00 AM before the Honorable Nathanael Cousins in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Counsel may participate by telephone. Case Management Statement due 9/4/2019. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Honorable Nathanael Cousins: http://cand.uscourts.gov/nc. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/4/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. and Ralph A. Dengler, Esq. for by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by TODD MATTHEW NOSHER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (NOSHER, TODD) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. MILLER on behalf of FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/8/14. (DD, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants FriendFinder Networks Inc. and Streamray Inc... (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FRIENDFINDER NETWORKS INC., STREAMRAY INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5720815) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISTION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Ntc, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.