This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:50:28 (UTC).

WAG Acquisition LLC v. Flying Crocodile Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 WAG Acquisition LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Flying Crocodile Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Richard Creatura and Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01278

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J Richard Creatura

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAG Acquisition LLC

Defendants

Flying Crocodile Inc

Does 1-20

Streamates Limited

ICF Technology Inc

FCI Inc

Accretive Technology Group Inc

Riser Apps LLC

Streamates Limited doing business as Streamates Limited LLC

Flying Crocodile Inc doing business as FCI Inc

Accretive Technology Group Inc doing business as Accretive Networks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PRO HAC VICE PENDING

Attorney at IRONSIDE NEWARK

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Ari Jason Jaffess

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Mord Michael Lewis

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

David G Liston

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Alex G Patchen

Attorney at LISTON ABRAMSON LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Steven W Fogg

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Eric A Lindberg

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Phillip G Ray

Attorney at KLUGER HEALEY, LLC

106 Apple Street, Suite 302

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

Jennifer Sheffield

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Adriane Michelle Scola

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Steven B Winters

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Justin Taylor Quinn

Attorney at ROBINSON MILLER LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

David A Ward

Attorney at KLUGER HEALEY, LLC

219 Broad Street

Red Bank, NJ 07701

Brian G Bodine

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

 

Court Documents

#44

No Description Available

146 #17

Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl.

134 #20

Exhibit S

131 #3

Exhibit A

124 #3

Exhibit C

122 #2

Exhibit 1

120 #16

A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter

105 #5

Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff

#103

RESTRICTED

#64

No Description Available

33 #10

Exhibit 9 to Abramson Declaration

24 #3

Exhibit 2

#11

No Description Available

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. WARD on behalf of ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2014)

1 #2

Certification

394 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#184) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/30/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#183) ORDER re #181 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David G. Liston for WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#182) ORDER re #179 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Mord Michael Lewis for WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#181) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David G. Liston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951864 (Fogg, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#180) ORDER re #176 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#179) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mord Michael Lewis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951803 (Fogg, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#178) ORDER re #175 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alex G Patchen for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#177) ORDER re #174 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ari J. Jaffess for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#176) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ronald Abramson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951774 (Fogg, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#175) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alex G. Patchen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5951740 (Fogg, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #8 Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/18/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent ORDER that the time for Defts to answer Complaint is extended for an additional 30 days, to 7/18/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/18/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Kluger Healey LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STREAMATES LIMITED, FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/14. (DD, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to FLYING CROCODILE, INC., FCI, INC., ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. WARD on behalf of ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 06/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Dianne C. Richards* (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC., DOES 1-20, FCI, INC., FLYING CROCODILE, INC., ICF TECHNOLOGY, INC., RISER APPS LLC, STREAMATES LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5653248) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 AO120 FORM, #2 Certification, #3 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only))(dr, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/14/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCI Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Accretive Technology Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Walter Fogg