This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2023 at 09:19:46 (UTC).

Wafaa Kassamani v. Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Wafaa Kassamani filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wafaa Kassamani

Defendants

Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.

M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald James Aaron Brock

Lindsay L Bowden

Douglas Hayes

Defendant Attorney

Jannine E Kranz

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates: Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 6/28/2024 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/16/2024 08:30 AM. See order for other deadlines. (lom) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/19/2024. (cb) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

15 #1

SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET

#15

(#15) Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani. (Attachments: #1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET)(Bowden, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#14

(#14) Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani. (Bowden, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#13

(#13) Plaintiff's Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#12

(#12) Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Donald James Aaron Brock on behalf of Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

1 #7

Certificate of Service

1 #6

Exhibit D to Kranz Declaration: Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.'s Answer

1 #5

Exhibit C to Kranz Declaration: Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.'s An

1 #4

Exhibit B to Kranz Declaration: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 #3

Exhibit A to Kranz Declaration: Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #2

Declaration of Jannine Kranz

1 #1

Declaration of Lacey Moore

#1

CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/07/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates: Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 6/28/2024 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/16/2024 08:30 AM. See order for other deadlines. (lom) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/19/2024. (cb) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the April 28, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani. (Attachments: #1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET)(Bowden, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani. (Bowden, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiff's Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Donald James Aaron Brock on behalf of Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/07/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/07/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. Jury Demanded. filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT LEGIBLE SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., (Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. identifying Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV02540 Receipt No: ACACDC-34925396 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lacey Moore, #2 Declaration of Jannine Kranz, #3 Exhibit A to Kranz Declaration: Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Kranz Declaration: Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit C to Kranz Declaration: Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.'s Answer, #6 Exhibit D to Kranz Declaration: Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.'s Answer, #7 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Jannine E Kranz added to party ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Jannine E Kranz added to party M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kranz, Jannine) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less