This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 10:01:38 (UTC).

WAECHTER v. EDER et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 WAECHTER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against EDER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03114

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THERESE WAECHTER

Defendants

TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA

JEFFREY A EDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher E. Clark

Attorney at GOODIN ABERNATHY LLP

301 East 38Th Street

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Defendant Attorneys

Heather L. Wilson

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Toni M. Everton

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel 1/26/2021, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2021. Discovery due by 10/4/2021. Defendant shall serve a settlement response by February 9, 2021, with an electronic copy to the Magistrate Judge at MJBaker@insd.uscourts.gov, which shall specifically set forth Defendant's position regarding the suggested timing of a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/29/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER . (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/5/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#8

(#8) First AMENDED Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER. (Clark, Christopher) Modified on 12/30/2020 (LDH). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Toni M. Everton on behalf of Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Wilson on behalf of Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to JEFFREY A EDER, and TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Clark on behalf of Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER. (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THERESE WAECHTER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6302195) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel 1/26/2021, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2021. Discovery due by 10/4/2021. Defendant shall serve a settlement response by February 9, 2021, with an electronic copy to the Magistrate Judge at MJBaker@insd.uscourts.gov, which shall specifically set forth Defendant's position regarding the suggested timing of a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/29/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER . (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/5/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First AMENDED Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER. (Clark, Christopher) Modified on 12/30/2020 (LDH). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re, filed by Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Toni M. Everton on behalf of Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Everton, Toni) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L. Wilson on behalf of Defendants JEFFREY A EDER, TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued as to JEFFREY A EDER, and TOWN OF BROWNSBURG, INDIANA. (DJH) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Clark on behalf of Plaintiff THERESE WAECHTER. (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THERESE WAECHTER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6302195) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher E. Clark