This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 08:58:25 (UTC).

WADE v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 WADE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARON WADE

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS S. DWECK

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14004643) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHARON WADE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DWECK, MORRIS) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2023) (krg, ). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet filed by MORRIS DWECK on 2/2/2023 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (krg, ) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 2/2/2023, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II). (krg, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (krg, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14004643) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHARON WADE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DWECK, MORRIS) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/6/2023) (krg, ). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less