This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2020 at 08:45:48 (UTC).

W. v. Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 W filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill N. Parrish and Paul M. Warner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00122

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

Referral Judge

Paul M. Warner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathan W.

Defendants

Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin

Aurora Health Care Inc Health and Welfare Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Nediha Hadzikadunic

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan W. as to Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin Waiver sent on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/2020. (jds) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #3 filed by Plaintiff Nathan W. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/5/20. (ss) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin, Aurora Health Care Inc Health and Welfare Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3499908) filed by Nathan W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Nathan W. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan W. as to Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin Waiver sent on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/9/2020. (jds) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/5/20. (ss) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #3 filed by Plaintiff Nathan W. (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/5/20. (ss) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem BlueCross BlueShield of Wisconsin, Aurora Health Care Inc Health and Welfare Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3499908) filed by Nathan W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Nathan W. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less