This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:38:57 (UTC).

W. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 W filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00597

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

R. W.

J. W.

Defendants

United Healthcare Insurance

United Behavioral Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Maralyn M. English

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Flpo Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Rebecca R. Hanson

Attorney at REED SMITH

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/13/21. (alf) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. W., J. W. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (King, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. W., J. W. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (King, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#6

(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Insurance to 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/2/21. (alf) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance, Plaintiffs J. W., R. W.. Form due by 12/27/2021. (alf) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance, Plaintiffs J. W., R. W.. Form due by 12/27/2021. (alf) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for United Behavioral Health and United Healthcare Insurance to 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/2/21. (alf) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Behavioral Health(pty:dft), Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. W., J. W. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (King, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. W., J. W. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (King, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/13/21. (alf) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4136852) filed by R. W., J. W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs J. W., R. W. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R. Hanson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maralyn M. English