This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:55:05 (UTC).

Vuly Pty Ltd v. Yang

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Vuly Pty Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Yang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David J. Novak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Novak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vuly Pty Ltd

Defendant

Wei Yang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam David Mandell

Attorney at Millen White Zelano & Branigan PC

2200 Clarendon Blvd, Suite 1400

Arlington, VA 22201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Vuly Pty Ltd's ("Plaintiff) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #8 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(i). Because Defendant has not filed either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims by Plaintiff against Defendant. This case is now CLOSED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/25/2020. (smej, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vuly Pty Ltd (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

7 #1

Hague Form

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Wei Yang. Signed and sealed summons and hague form mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 Hague Form) (smej, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Vuly Pty Ltd for Hague Form for Service (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Governing Procedures Until the IPC --SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/3/2020. (cgar) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 9,399,152. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons for Wei Yang by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

1 #4

Financial Disclosure

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Complaint For Misappropriation, Tortious Interference With Business Expectancy, And Declaratory Judgement Of Patent Ownership (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7366190), filed by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Financial Disclosure) (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Vuly Pty Ltd's ("Plaintiff) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #8 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(i). Because Defendant has not filed either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims by Plaintiff against Defendant. This case is now CLOSED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/25/2020. (smej, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vuly Pty Ltd (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Wei Yang. Signed and sealed summons and hague form mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 Hague Form) (smej, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Vuly Pty Ltd for Hague Form for Service (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Governing Procedures Until the IPC --SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/3/2020. (cgar) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified service on the defendant is outside of the United States. The proper paperwork and any additional fees must be paid to the Clerk's Office, depending on how they choose to serve the defendant. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 9,399,152. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons for Wei Yang by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney has been instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. The filing attorney has also been instructed to file the Financial Disclosure Statement using the correct docket event. (smej, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint For Misappropriation, Tortious Interference With Business Expectancy, And Declaratory Judgement Of Patent Ownership (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7366190), filed by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Financial Disclosure) (Mandell, Adam) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less