This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 07:50:56 (UTC).

VULPE v. SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 VULPE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD J. PAPPERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04709

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD J. PAPPERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENIAMIN VULPE

Defendant

SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI

Attorney at SALTZ, MONGELUZZI, BARRETT & BENDESKY, P.C.

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL A. BUDNER

Attorney at SALTZ, MONGELUZZI, BARRETT & BENDESKY, P.C.

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANDREW R. DUFFY

Attorney at SALTZ MONGELUZZI BARRETT BENDESKY PC

1650 Market St., 52Nd Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

J. PETER VELOSKI

709 Sears St

Philadelphia, PA 19147

Defendant Attorneys

MARK E. GOTTLIEB

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN

Ten Penn Center Suite 2300, 1801 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MEGAN K. SHANNON

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN PA

1801 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSHUA D. GROFF

Attorney at GREEN SILVERSTEIN & GROFF LLC

215 South Broad St Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Filed Complaint

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by VENIAMIN VULPE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Complaint)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. BUDNER on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (BUDNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by J. PETER VELOSKI on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (VELOSKI, J.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW R. DUFFY on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (DUFFY, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Brief and Exhibit.(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, OCTOBER 16, 2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/6/2020. 10/6/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. GROFF on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(GROFF, JOSHUA) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND JURY DEMAND(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Designation Form

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14591942), filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form)(SHANNON, MEGAN) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by VENIAMIN VULPE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Complaint)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. BUDNER on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (BUDNER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by J. PETER VELOSKI on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (VELOSKI, J.) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW R. DUFFY on behalf of VENIAMIN VULPE (DUFFY, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pltf Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.Memorandum, Brief and Exhibit.(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FRIDAY, OCTOBER 16, 2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/6/2020. 10/6/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. GROFF on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(GROFF, JOSHUA) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND JURY DEMAND(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14591942), filed by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form)(SHANNON, MEGAN) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less