This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 09:59:09 (UTC).

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC et al v. Kerr Machine Co.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kerr Machine Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01033

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vulcan Energy Services, LLC

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC

Cizion, LLC doing business as Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC

Defendant

Kerr Machine Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Paul Davis

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

811 Main St, Ste 3130

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey S Whittle

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 3130

Houston, TX 77002

Jean C Frizzell

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell

1100 Louisiana St, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Jeremy L Doyle

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana St, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Barry Jeff Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

100 Light St, 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorney

Brian Douglas Melton

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 5/10/21.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint, by Kerr Machine Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2021. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed.(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2021. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Doyle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean C. Frizzell on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Whittle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kerr Machine Co. served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021, filed.(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/18/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Kerr Machine Co.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kerr Machine Co. filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kerr Machine Co., filed.(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kerr Machine Co. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26188332) filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vulcan Energy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kerr Machine Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy L Doyle