This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 12:43:27 (UTC).

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC et al v. Defendant Kerr Machine Co. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Defendant Kerr Machine Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01852

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC

Vulcan Energy Services, LLC

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC

Cizion, LLC doing business as Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC

Defendants

Mark S. Nowell

Defendant Kerr Machine Co.

Kelcy Jake Foster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jean C Frizzell

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell

1100 Louisiana St, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Jeremy L Doyle

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana St, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Barry Jeff Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

100 Light St 26Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorneys

Rocco Magni

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Brian Douglas Melton

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed.(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rocco F. Magni on behalf of Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed. (Magni, Rocco) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Melton on behalf of Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed.(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Barry Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2020. (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mark S. Nowell, filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kelcy Jake Foster, filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Defendant Kerr Machine Co., filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24714239) filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed.(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rocco F. Magni on behalf of Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed. (Magni, Rocco) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Melton on behalf of Defendant Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell, filed. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed.(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint, by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Barry Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2020. (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mark S. Nowell, filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kelcy Jake Foster, filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Defendant Kerr Machine Co., filed.(Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24714239) filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vulcan Energy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy L Doyle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jean C Frizzell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry Jeff Herman