This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:39:31 (UTC).

Vu v. RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Vu filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00680

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonny Vu

Defendant

RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Courtney H. G. Herz

Attorney at Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green PA

1000 Elm St, Po Box 3701

Manchester, NH 03105-3701

Anne T. Freeland

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

2750 East Cottonwood Parkway, Ste 560

Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

One South Pinckney Street, Ste 700

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorneys

Devin K. Bolger

Attorney at Devine Millimet & Branch PA

111 Amherst St

Manchester, NH 03101

Robert J. Bogdanowicz, III

Attorney at Calhoun, Bhella & Sechrest, LLP

325 N. Saint Paul St., Ste. 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Whitney L. Warren

Attorney at Calhoun, Bhella & Sechrest, LLP

325 N. Saint Paul St., Ste. 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew R. Johnson

Attorney at Devine Millimet & Branch PA

111 Amherst Street

Manchester, NH 03104

 

Court Documents

15 #7

Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain

15 #6

Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card

15 #5

Exhibit A-3 Sale Order

15 #4

Exhibit A-2 Contrct

15 #3

Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain

15 #2

Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III

15 #1

Memorandum of Law

#15

(#15) Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contrct, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

14 #7

Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain

4 #3

Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit

4 #2

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III

4 #1

Memorandum of Law

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. by Sonny Vu. Served/Mailed on 6/25/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

2 #1

Notice ECF

#2

(#2) Summons issued electronically as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #2

Summons - Waiver

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1829399 filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. MOTION REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15. (js) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contrct, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contract, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Denied as moot in light of the Amended Complaint filed on August 1, 2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Sonny Vu's Objection to Defendant RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, #2 Exhibit A to Memo of Law - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B to Memo of Law - judicial caseload profiles)(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) OBJECTION to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Sonny Vu's Objection to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B - Email, #4 Exhibit C - Website and Facebook)(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. with jury demand filed by Sonny Vu.(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert J. Bogdanowicz III, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion for Whitney L. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Whitney L. Warren, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841033.) filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Robert Bogdanowicz III)(Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Assented to MOTION for Anne T. Freeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1839939.) filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anne T. Freeland, Esq.)(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Devin K. Bolger on behalf of RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. Attorney Devin K. Bolger added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bolger, Devin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. JOINT Discovery Plan DUE BY 8/23/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add: Refiled text(js). (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Matthew R. Johnson added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service Executed as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. by Sonny Vu. Served/Mailed on 6/25/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons issued electronically as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-680-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1829399 filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Herz, Courtney) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney L. Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Bogdanowicz, III