This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 08:03:15 (UTC).

Natalia Voytova v. Reel Halo, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Natalia Voytova filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Reel Halo, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalia Voytova

Defendants

Reel Halo, LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Amazon.com Services LLC

DOES 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Lipel

Attorney at Law Offices of Katherine Lipel

16001 Ventura Boulevard Suite 100

Encino, CA 91436

Svetlana Liberman

Attorney at Law Offices of Katherine Lipel

16001 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 100

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

M Ray Hartman, III

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2594

Melissa H Rose

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Road Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2594

Jacob Logan Speckhard

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#11

(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Please be advised that the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies was inadvertently issued on this case #9 . (yl) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#9

(#9) [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR #10 ] NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) Modified on 1/25/2023 (yl). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Rose, Melissa) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on January 13, 2023. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., identifying Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.; Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC; Defendant Real Halo LLC; Hatch Light LLC; Plaintiff Natalia Voytova; Zurich American Insurance Company. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

1 #11

Exhibit 2 to Speckhard Declaration (Hatch Light LLC)

1 #10

Exhibit 1 to Speckhard Declaration (Reel Halo)

1 #8

Exhibit H (LASC Docket Summary)

1 #7

Exhibit G (Proof of Service of Summons)

1 #4

Exhibit D (Notice of Case Assignment)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Summons)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV04209 Receipt No: ACACDC-34617157 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Amendment to Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Notice of Case Assignment), #5 Exhibit E (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #6 Exhibit F (Declaration of Non Service), #7 Exhibit G (Proof of Service of Summons), #8 Exhibit H (LASC Docket Summary), #9 Declaration of Jacob Speckhard in support of Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 1 to Speckhard Declaration (Reel Halo), #11 Exhibit 2 to Speckhard Declaration (Hatch Light LLC)) (Attorney Jacob Logan Speckhard added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Logan Speckhard added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Please be advised that the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies was inadvertently issued on this case #9 . (yl) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR #10 ] NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) Modified on 1/25/2023 (yl). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Rose, Melissa) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Natalia Voytova in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/2/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on January 13, 2023. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., identifying Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.; Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC; Defendant Real Halo LLC; Hatch Light LLC; Plaintiff Natalia Voytova; Zurich American Insurance Company. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV04209 Receipt No: ACACDC-34617157 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Amendment to Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Notice of Case Assignment), #5 Exhibit E (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #6 Exhibit F (Declaration of Non Service), #7 Exhibit G (Proof of Service of Summons), #8 Exhibit H (LASC Docket Summary), #9 Declaration of Jacob Speckhard in support of Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 1 to Speckhard Declaration (Reel Halo), #11 Exhibit 2 to Speckhard Declaration (Hatch Light LLC)) (Attorney Jacob Logan Speckhard added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Logan Speckhard added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Speckhard, Jacob) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less