This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 10:54:03 (UTC).

Vorderbrug v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Vorderbrug filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harry H. Vorderbrug, III

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Clarence Cusmano

Attorney at Jim Kelly Law, PC

30300 Northwestern Hwy., Ste. 324

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

James J. Kelly

Attorney at Jim Kelly Law, PC

30300 Northwestern Hwy., Ste. 324

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant Attorney

Cary R. Berlin

Attorney at Patrick Johnson & Mott PC

70 Macomb Pl., Ste. 224

Mt. Clemens, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/15/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 7/9/2021 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021 (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (slk) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by Harry H. Vorderbrug, III (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/15/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 7/9/2021 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James J. Kelly on behalf of plaintiff Harry H. Vorderbrug, III (Kelly, James) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021 (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (slk) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Harry H. Vorderbrug, III in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6415726 (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by Harry H. Vorderbrug, III (Cusmano, John) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J. Kelly